|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4181.).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4887.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|