|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 255, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:05 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5951.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4473.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 4917.)
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|