California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2274 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2012

Amended

Bill July 3, 2012
Bill May 15, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012