|
07/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5600.).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4224.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4677.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|