|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3180.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (September 9). Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3233.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2190.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1277.)
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 30).
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|