05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4786.) | |||
05/03/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |||
04/23/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/19/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |||
04/12/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
04/11/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |