California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2292 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012