California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill June 13, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012