|
06/13/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4886.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|