|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 786, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6142.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4584.).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 4489.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|