|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 586, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 13. Page 6112.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4572.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 4892.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|