LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2314
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2314
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2314
Compare Versions
AB2314 Chaptered August 27, 2012
AB2314 Enrolled August 13, 2012
AB2314 Amended July 2, 2012
AB2314 Amended June 14, 2012
AB2314 Amended April 26, 2012
AB2314 Amended April 11, 2012
AB2314 Amended March 29, 2012
AB2314 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2314 Chaptered August 27, 2012
AB2314 Enrolled August 13, 2012
AB2314 Amended July 2, 2012
AB2314 Amended June 14, 2012
AB2314 Amended April 26, 2012
AB2314 Amended April 11, 2012
AB2314 Amended March 29, 2012
AB2314 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare