|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 681, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6656.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4953.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4344.)
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 27).
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|