|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 787, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 31). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6787.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6788.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5023.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4322.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4985.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|