|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 788, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4648.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 19. Page 5131.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|