|
07/03/2012
|
Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4673.)
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|