LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2327
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2327
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2327
Compare Versions
AB2327 Chaptered September 23, 2012
AB2327 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB2327 Amended August 6, 2012
AB2327 Amended June 25, 2012
AB2327 Amended April 16, 2012
AB2327 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB2327 Chaptered September 23, 2012
AB2327 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB2327 Amended August 6, 2012
AB2327 Amended June 25, 2012
AB2327 Amended April 16, 2012
AB2327 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare