08/27/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |||
08/24/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/23/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
08/09/2012 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/07/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
08/06/2012 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4786.) | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |