08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/06/2012 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/05/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/03/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2). | |||
06/26/2012 | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
05/29/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5069.) | |||
05/17/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4871.) | |||
04/26/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25). | |||
04/11/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |