|
09/30/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 33. Page 6585.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 4870.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 28. Page 5211.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|