California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2012

Amended

Bill August 9, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill June 12, 2012