|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 5064.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|