|
08/30/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 4881.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|