California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2356 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill May 30, 2012
Bill May 8, 2012
Bill April 25, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012