|
07/05/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4281.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4558.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|