|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 682, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6564.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4888.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4787.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4984.)
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|