|
02/01/2012
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 44. Noes 24. Page 3514.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Ayes 44. Noes 24. Page 3514.)
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (January 9).
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|