05/31/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/21/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/21/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 4916.) | |||
05/14/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (May 9). | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |