|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 546, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6657.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4947.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 4981.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|