|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6514.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4871.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5034.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|