|
09/21/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6659.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4932.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lieu.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4677.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|