|
08/16/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Page 4532.)
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 5. Page 4975.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4913.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4444.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4444.) (pending re-referral to Com. on HEALTH.)
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|