06/20/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
04/30/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4600.) | |||
04/25/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23). | |||
04/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |