|
09/09/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2438.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (September 7).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Page 2225.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2226.)
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1047.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|