|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 4918.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|