California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012
Bill July 9, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill June 6, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012