California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill June 19, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012