|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 260, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4485.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 4710.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|