|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 5192.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|