|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 5066.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|