LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB240
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB240
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB240
Compare Versions
AB240 Chaptered September 7, 2011
AB240 Enrolled August 24, 2011
AB240 Amended July 11, 2011
AB240 Amended June 2, 2011
AB240 Amended March 8, 2011
AB240 Introduced February 3, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB240 Chaptered September 7, 2011
AB240 Enrolled August 24, 2011
AB240 Amended July 11, 2011
AB240 Amended June 2, 2011
AB240 Amended March 8, 2011
AB240 Introduced February 3, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare