|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 559, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6801.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 6802.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 18. Page 5094.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 20. Page 4909.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4909.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5133.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|