05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/02/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 23). | |||
04/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/12/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
04/11/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |