|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 674, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6418.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 4779.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4557.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4484.)
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 16).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|