California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2012

Amended

Bill May 14, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012