|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5067.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|