05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/02/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/24/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 18). | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
04/12/2012 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 4344.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 4344.) (Pending re-referral to Com. on G.O.) | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |