05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
05/03/2012 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4654.) (Pending re-referral from the Com. on HEALTH.) | |||
05/02/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/23/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |