California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB242 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 31, 2011
Bill June 29, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill March 14, 2011