04/25/2012 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/24/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/23/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/10/2012 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |